+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 880
- Third Reading Passed
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scofield motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 381
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 380
- South Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 379
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2017: Roll 880
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
April 4, 2017: Roll 379
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2017: Roll 380
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
April 4, 2017: Roll 381
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor