+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 5, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-2)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 11:42 a.m. on February 11, 2021.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Assigned Act No. 2021-2.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 134
- Third Reading Passed
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Poole Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Ways and Means Education first Substitute offered
- Motion to adopted Roll Call 6
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 7
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 8
- Isbell intended to vote "yea"
- Engrossed
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 10, 2021: Roll 134
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
February 4, 2021: Roll 6
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
February 4, 2021: Roll 7
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 11
February 4, 2021: Roll 8
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor