+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2013-295.
- Conference Committee on HB19 2013RS first Substitute Offered
- Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred in Conference Report
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Concurrence Requested
- Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1038
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report
- Williams (J) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1194
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Requested
- Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 718 P&PO appoints Holley, Dial and Keahey
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 652
- Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 653
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Williams (J) motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1023 House appoints Williams (J), Hammon and Grimsley
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- Unfinished Business
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Newton (C) Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 416
- McMillan Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 417
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 418
- Cosponsors Added
- Engrossed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
May 20, 2013: Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1038
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
May 9, 2013: Williams (J) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1194
- Yeas: 93
May 2, 2013: Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 718 P&PO appoints Holley, Dial and Keahey
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
April 30, 2013: Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 652
- Yeas: 28
April 30, 2013: Williams (J) motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1023 House appoints Williams (J), Hammon and Grimsley
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 3
April 30, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 653
- Yeas: 28
April 24, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Yeas: 10
April 11, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 417
- Yeas: 100
April 11, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 416
- Yeas: 98
April 11, 2013: Cosponsors Added
- Yeas: 54
- Absent: 3