+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-186)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-186.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sanders motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 706
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 705
- Signature Requested
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:29 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- McCampbell motion Local Application adopted Roll Call 87
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 86
- Third Reading Passed
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2018: Roll 705
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 9
March 8, 2018: Roll 706
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 9
January 25, 2018: Roll 86
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 35
January 25, 2018: Roll 87
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 60
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor