+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 1:52 p.m. on May 5, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-156.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 691
- Third Reading Passed
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 313
- Third Reading Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2015: Roll 691
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
April 9, 2015: Roll 313
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor