+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
- Concurrence Requested
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Livingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 54
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 55
- Livingston Amendment Offered
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 43
- South intended to vote "Yea"
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2015-502.
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 16
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 15
- Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
August 10, 2015: Roll 43
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 47
August 10, 2015: Roll 54
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
August 10, 2015: Roll 55
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
August 5, 2015: Roll 15
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 11
August 5, 2015: Roll 16
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor