+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 24, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-327)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:27 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2021-327.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1275
- Third Reading Passed
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Scott intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 12
- Third Reading Passed
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2021: Roll 1275
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
February 4, 2021: Roll 12
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor