+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor on January 23, 2014 at 12:18 p.m.
- Assigned Act No. 2014-2.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 106
- Third Reading Passed
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Legislation No. 1 as Favorable
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 4
- Third Reading Passed
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Vote
January 23, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 106
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor