+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Education Policy 1st Substitute
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On March 5, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- EP Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 200
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 201
- Engrossed
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 200 Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 201 Vote
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor