+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 6:38 p.m. on March 18, 2014.
- Assigned Act No. 2014-206.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 794
- Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 258
- Third Reading Passed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation
+ − Vote
March 18, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 794
- Yeas: 26
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor