+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor at 3:50 p.m. on April 25, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-168.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 596
- Third Reading Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 406
- Third Reading Passed
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 596
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
April 24, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Love
Type:
Primary Sponsor