+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
- Assigned Act No. 2017-245.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 754
- Third Reading Passed
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 386
- Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2017: Roll 754
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
April 4, 2017: Roll 386
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor