+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-285)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2018-285.
- Forwarded to Governor at 12:09 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Davis motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 803
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Ward Amendment Offered
- Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 780
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 781
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered
- Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 655
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Moore (M) Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 192
- Sells intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 193
- Members intended to cosponsor
- Engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Votes (7)
March 15, 2018: Roll 803
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 10
March 13, 2018: Roll 780
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 13, 2018: Roll 781
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 6, 2018: Roll 655
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 9
February 6, 2018: Roll 192
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 14
February 6, 2018: Roll 194
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 92
February 6, 2018: Roll 193
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor