+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Read Second Time in Second House
On April 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- County and Municipal Government 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On April 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 365
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
April 2, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 365 Vote
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor