+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2020-113)
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on May 5, 2020.
- Assigned Act No. 2020-113.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 450
- Third Reading Passed
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 119
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 118
- Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Rereferred from CC&E to W&MGF
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
+ − Votes (3)
May 5, 2020: Roll 450
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
February 25, 2020: Roll 118
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 8
February 25, 2020: Roll 119
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor