+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:48 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
- Assigned Act No. 2014-317.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1029
- Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 576
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 575
- Financial Services Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1029
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
March 5, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 575
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor