+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 350
- Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 15
- Third Reading Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (3)
March 16, 2017: Roll 350
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
February 16, 2017: Roll 14
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 70
February 16, 2017: Roll 15
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 86
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor