+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Enacted
On April 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Ready to Enroll
- Ready to Enroll
- Enrolled
- Enrolled
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Judiciary 1st Amendment Offered
- Livingston motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 378
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 379
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On March 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Judiciary 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- JUDY Reported Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 162
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 163
- Engrossed
On February 22, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (6)
April 9, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2024: Livingston motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 378 Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 379 Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 29, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
February 29, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 162 Vote
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 1
February 29, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 163 Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor