+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Education and Youth Affairs Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 519
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 520
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 492
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Education Policy Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 102
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 103
- Engrossed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2017: Roll 492
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 11
April 11, 2017: Roll 519
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
April 11, 2017: Roll 520
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
February 28, 2017: Roll 102
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 7
February 28, 2017: Roll 103
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor