+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2020-34)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:11 p.m. on March 10, 2020.
- Assigned Act No. 2020-34.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 323
- Third Reading Passed
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth and Human Services
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Cosponsors Added
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 101
- Third Reading Passed
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2020: Roll 323
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
February 25, 2020: Roll 101
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
February 25, 2020: Roll 102
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 37
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor