+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-276)
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-276.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 975
- Third Reading Passed
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 157
- Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2019: Roll 975
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
April 9, 2019: Roll 157
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor