+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-89)
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-89.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 307
- Concurrence Requested
- Forwarded to Governor at 3:51 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 347
- Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 346
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 128
- Third Reading Passed
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Votes (4)
April 23, 2019: Roll 307
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2019: Roll 346
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2019: Roll 347
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2019: Roll 128
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor