+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 69
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 68
- Agriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2020: Roll 68
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 1
February 20, 2020: Roll 69
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor