+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-425)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 8:42 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
- Assigned Act No. 2021-425.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1332
- Third Reading Passed
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 604
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 603
- Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2021: Roll 1332
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
April 1, 2021: Roll 603
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 11
April 1, 2021: Roll 604
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor