+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Further Consideration
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1053
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1052
- England Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1051
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (3)
May 23, 2019: Roll 1051
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 5
May 23, 2019: Roll 1052
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2019: Roll 1053
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor