+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-508)
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-508.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 462
- Third Reading Passed
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On August 20, 0018 in the House:
- Lost in House of Origin
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2018: Roll 1078
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
February 22, 2018: Roll 462
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor