+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-127)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2019-127.
- Delivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on May 2, 2019.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 448
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 181
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2019: Roll 448
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 11, 2019: Roll 181
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor