+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-393)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Forwarded to Governor at 3:34 p.m. on March 21, 2018.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 931
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2018-393.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 362
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2018: Roll 931
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
February 15, 2018: Roll 362
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 23
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor