+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Forwarded to Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2013-397.
- Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1194
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1195
- Third Reading Passed
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1285
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 698
- Smitherman motion to rerefer
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 772
- Hill motion to Table adopted Roll Call 771
- Insurance first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 20, 2013: Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1285
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 6
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1195
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
May 20, 2013: Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1194
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2013: Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 698
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 9
April 24, 2013: Hill motion to Table adopted Roll Call 771
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor