+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 52
- Third Reading Passed
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-515.
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 6
- Engrossed
- Hurst motion to reconsider adopted voice vote
- Hurst first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 23
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 24
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
August 10, 2015: Roll 52
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 14
August 5, 2015: Roll 23
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 81
August 5, 2015: Roll 24
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 78
August 5, 2015: Roll 6
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 80
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor