+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 1:23 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-293.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1032
- Third Reading Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 932
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 70
- Third Reading Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1032
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
May 9, 2013: Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 932
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor