+ − Effective Date
- April 13, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-395.
- Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Concurred in Conference Report
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1030
- Conference Report Concurrence Requested
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Garrett motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 928
- Conference Report
- Conference Committee on HB138 2022RS first Substitute Offered
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Garrett motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Voice Vote 920 House appoints
- Concurrence Requested
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Requested
- Reed motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 950 P&PO appoints Smitherman, Orr and Marsh P&PO appoints Smitherman, Orr and Marsh
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 884
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 883
- Orr first Substitute Offered
- Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Passed
- Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 490
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 489
- Third Reading Passed
- Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 6, 2022: Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1030 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 6, 2022: Garrett motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 928 Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2022: Garrett motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Voice Vote 920 House appoints Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2022: Reed motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 950 P&PO appoints Smitherman, Orr and Marsh P&PO appoints Smitherman, Orr and Marsh Vote
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 489 Vote
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 490 Vote
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor