+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 804
- Third Reading Passed
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
April 24, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 804
- Yeas: 94
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor