+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Action
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2016: Roll 270
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
March 8, 2016: Roll 271
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
February 17, 2016: Roll 131
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
February 17, 2016: Roll 132
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
May 7, 2015: Roll 861
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 14
April 2, 2015: Roll 209
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor