+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2020-90)
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:40 p.m. on May 7, 2020.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2020-90.
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 573
- Chambliss motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 574
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 83
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 82
- Third Reading Passed
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (4)
May 6, 2020: Roll 573
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
May 6, 2020: Roll 574
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
February 25, 2020: Roll 82
- Yeas: 65
- Present/NV: 40
February 25, 2020: Roll 83
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 45
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor