+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Transportation and Energy
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 179
- Third Reading Passed
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
+ − Vote
March 3, 2020: Roll 179
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor