+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 879
- Third Reading Passed
- Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 878
- Sanford Amendment Offered
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Hill (J) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 775
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Pringle intended to vote "Nay"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 626
- Third Reading Passed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2016: Roll 775
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 12
April 28, 2016: Roll 878
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
April 28, 2016: Roll 879
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
April 19, 2016: Roll 626
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 22
April 13, 2016: Roll 608
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 11
March 3, 2016: Roll 294
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor