+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
- Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 492
- Third Reading Passed
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
March 18, 2021: Roll 492
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor