+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 340
- Third Reading Passed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 6
April 9, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 340
- Yeas: 97
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor