+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-197)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:38 p.m. on March 6, 2018.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-197.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 555
- Local Legislation, Mobile County Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 556
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Clarke motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 580
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 283
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 282
- Clarke Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 281
- Mobile County Legislation Amendment Offered
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Mobile County
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Third Reading Passed
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2018: Roll 555
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 11
March 1, 2018: Roll 556
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 11
March 1, 2018: Roll 580
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 5
February 13, 2018: Roll 281
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 75
February 13, 2018: Roll 282
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 66
February 13, 2018: Roll 283
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 69
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor