+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-388)
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2018-388.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Lawrence motion Local Application Roll Call 1060
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1153
- Reed motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 1154
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 687
- Third Reading Passed
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2018: Roll 1060
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 45
March 22, 2018: Roll 1153
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 22, 2018: Roll 1154
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 8, 2018: Roll 687
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 28
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor