+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 6:13 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2015-501.
- Enrolled
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 51
- Third Reading Passed
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 26
- Third Reading Passed
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
August 10, 2015: Roll 51
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
August 6, 2015: Roll 26
- Yeas: 65
- Present/NV: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor