+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-568)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-568.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1080
- Concurrence Requested
- Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Melson Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1041
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1042
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 841
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 840
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 839
- W&ME 2nd Amendment Offered
- W&ME 1st Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Votes (6)
March 28, 2018: Roll 1080
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 5
March 22, 2018: Roll 1041
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 22, 2018: Roll 1042
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 15, 2018: Roll 839
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 11
March 15, 2018: Roll 840
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 12
March 15, 2018: Roll 841
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor