+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Judiciary first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 181
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 182
- Engrossed
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2020: Roll 181
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 7
March 3, 2020: Roll 182
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor