+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Holtzclaw table Holtzclaw motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 842
- Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
- Judiciary first Amendment Offered
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
- Smitherman motion to rerefer
- Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 695
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Public Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 974
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment #1 Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 975
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment #2 Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 976
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 977
- Engrossed
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 2 amendments
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
May 7, 2013: Holtzclaw table Holtzclaw motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 842
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 8
May 7, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Yeas: 9
May 2, 2013: Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 695
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 10
April 25, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 977
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 11
April 25, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 975
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
April 25, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 974
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 3
April 25, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 976
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor