+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 17, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-366)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-366.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1217
- Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor at 2:07 p.m. on April 29, 2021.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Pettus first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
- Pettus motion to Table adopted Roll Call 394
- Engrossed
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 395
- Pettus Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 396
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 397
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 29, 2021: Roll 1217
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
March 11, 2021: Roll 394
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 15
March 11, 2021: Roll 395
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 6
March 11, 2021: Roll 396
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 8
March 11, 2021: Roll 397
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor