+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Carried Over
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Further Consideration
- Albritton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 346
- Third Reading Passed
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred from Calendar to W&MGF
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
March 9, 2021: Roll 346
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor