+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-73)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on April 18, 2019 at 11:34 a.m. on April 18, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-73.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 242
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 31
- Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2019: Roll 242
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
March 21, 2019: Roll 31
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor