+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:31 p.m. on August 7, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-514.
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 46
- Third Reading Passed
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 4
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
August 7, 2015: Roll 46
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 12
August 5, 2015: Roll 4
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 74
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor