+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-411)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:17 a.m. on March 22, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-411.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 992
- Third Reading Passed
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 382
- Third Reading Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2018: Roll 992
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
February 20, 2018: Roll 382
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor